Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams

  • MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
  • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
  • Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams
  • MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUTS FOR MATHS or MATHEMATICS AND
  • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS AND CHILDREN 
MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS AVAILABLE HERE

Square a 2 Digit Number Ending in 5

For this example we will use 25
• Take the "tens" part of the number (the 2 and add 1)=3
• Multiply the original "tens" part of the number by the new number (2x3)
• Take the result (2x3=6) and put 25 behind it. Result the answer 625.
Try a few more 75 squared ... = 7x8=56 ... put 25 behind it is 5625.
55 squared = 5x6=30 ... put 25 behind it ... is 3025. Another easy one! Practice it on paper first!
SINGLE STEP: 35 square
(3x[3+1]) / (5x5) = 12 / 25 = 1225
Square 2 Digit Number: UP-DOWN Method 

Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
• Look for the nearest 10 boundary
• In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
• Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
• Now mentally multiply 34x40
• The way I do it is 34x10=340;
• Double it mentally to 680
• Double it again mentally to 1360
• This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
• 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.
• Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.
• 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
• Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
• Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

With practice this can easily be done in your head.
 
Easy Multiplication By 11

You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first!
To multiply any two digit number by 11:
• For this example we will use 54.
• Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).
• Notice the hole between them!
• Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)
• Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 x 54=594
The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9, you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. For example 11 x 57 ... 5__7 ... 5+7=12 ... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ... 11 x 57 = 627
Practice it on paper first!

Easy Multiplication By The 11 Rule Expanded

You can directly write down the answer to any number multiplied by 11.
• Take for example the number 51236 X 11.
• First, write down the number with a zero in front of it.
051236
The zero is necessary so that the rules are simpler.
• Draw a line under the number.
• Bear with me on this one. It is simple if you work through it slowly. To do this, all you have to do this is "Add the neighbor". Look at the 6 in the "units" position of the number. Since there is no number to the right of it, you can't add to its "neighbor" so just write down 6 below the 6 in the units col.
• For the "tens" place, add the 3 to the its "neighbor" (the 6). Write the answer: 9 below the 3.
• For the "hundreds" place, add the 2 to the its "neighbor" (the 3). Write the answer: 5 below the 2.
• For the "thousands" place, add the 1 to the its "neighbor" (the 2). Write the answer: 3 below the 1.
• For the "ten-thousands" place, add the 5 to the its "neighbor" (the 1). Write the answer: 6 below the 5.
• For the "hundred-thousands" place, add the 0 to the its "neighbor" (the 5). Write the answer: 5 below the 0.
That's it ... 11 X 051236 = 563596

Finger Math: 9X Rule Easy Multiplication By 9

To multiply by 9,try this:
(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.
(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.
(3) the answer is 27 ... READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.

This works for anything up to 9x10!

Multiply By 4

To quickly multiply by four, double the number and then double it again.
Often this can be done in your head.
Multiply By 5
To quickly multiply by 5, divide the number in two and then multiply it by 10. Often this can be done quickly in your head.
  • MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
  • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
  • Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams
  • MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUTS FOR MATHS or MATHEMATICS AND
  • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS AND CHILDREN 

0 comments:

Post a Comment

Labels

About Site (1) ALBHABETS SERIES (1) All Exams Shortcuts (1) All Generation Computers (1) ALL INDIAN BANKS (1) ANALOGY (1) ANALOGY 2 (1) ASTROLOGY (1) AVERAGE (1) BANK LOANS PROCEDURE (1) BANKING KNOWLEDGE (1) BANKING SERVICES IN INDIA (1) BANKING SYSTEM IN INDIA (1) Banks Details (1) BLOOD RELATIONS (1) BOATS AND STREAMS (1) BOOKS FOR ENGLISH (1) CLASSIFICATION (1) Classification of computers (1) CLERICAL APTITUDE (1) CLERICAL APTITUDE SHORT CUT (1) CLOZE TEST (1) CO-OPERATIVE BANKS (1) Coded inequality (1) CODING DECODING (1) COMMON ERRORS (1) COMMON ERRORS 1 (1) COMPUTER FUNDAMENTALS (1) Computer Hardware (1) COMPUTER KNOWLEDGE (1) CONCEPTS OF INTERNET (1) CONSUMER BEHAVIOUR (1) Credit Card is lost or stolen? (1) Credit card rejected (1) CURRENT AFFAIRS (1) Data sufficiency (1) Deregulation of Banking System (1) DIRECTION TEST (1) DISTRIBUTION CHANNELS (1) ELEMENTARY ALGEBRA (1) Elementary Mensuration (1) ENGLISG COMPREHENSION TEST (1) ENGLISH LANGUAGE (1) ENGLISH LANGUAGE 1 (1) ENGLISH LANGUAGE 2 (1) ENGLISH SHORT CUTS (1) ENGLISH SYLLABUS (1) Export Import Bank of India (1) Features of credit card (1) FILL IN THE BLANKS (1) FINANCIAL AND BANKING (1) FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS (1) FINANCIAL OR BANKING SECTOR (1) Foreign Banks in India (1) FRACTIONS (1) GENERAL ENGLISH (1) GENERAL KNOWLEDGE (G.K) (1) HCF AND LCM (1) HUNDRED GOLDEN RULES 1 (1) HUNDRED GOLDEN RULES 2 (1) HUNDRED GOLDEN RULES 3 (1) HUNDRED GOLDEN RULES 4 (1) IBPS CLERK NOTIFICATION (1) IBPS Supplementary Exam (1) IBPS Supplementary Exam 1 (1) IMPORTANCE OF MARKETING 1 (1) IMPORTANCE OF MARKETING 2 (1) INDUSTRIAL CREDIT (1) INDUSTRIAL INVESTMENT (1) Industries Development Bank of India (1) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY (1) LEARNING OBJECTIVES (1) LIC (1) LUCKY NO (1) MAJOR BANKS IN INDIA (1) MANAGEMENT PROCESS (1) MARKET SEGMENTATION (1) MARKET SITUATIONS (1) MARKETING KNOWLEDGE (1) MARKETING KNOWLEDGE 1 (1) MARKETING PLANNING (1) MATHS SHORTCUTS (1) MIS-SPELT WORDS (1) MONEY TRANSFER (1) Money Transfer to India (1) MS-DOS (1) MS-Excel (1) MS-Word (1) MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUTS (1) Multiplication Tables (1) NUMBER - 1 (1) NUMBER - 2 (1) NUMBER - 3 (1) NUMBER - 4 (1) NUMBER - 5 (1) NUMBER - 6 (1) NUMBER - 8 (1) NUMBER - 9 (1) NUMBER -7 (1) Number Ranking (1) NUMBER SYSTEM (1) NUMERICAL ABILITY (1) NUMERICAL ABILITY 1 (1) NUMEROLOGY (1) NUMEROLOGY DETAILS (1) open a Bank account (1) Operating Systems (1) PARTNERSHIP (1) Payments from Dubai (1) PERCENTAGES (1) PHRASE REPLACEMENT (1) PIPES AND CISTERNS (1) PLASTIC MONEY (1) Problems based on ages (1) PROFIT AND LOSS (1) Public Sector Banks in India (1) PUZZLE TEST (1) QUANTITATIVE APTITUDE (1) RATIO AND PROPORTION (1) RBI Collection and Furnishing (1) RBI GOVERNORS (1) REARRANGEMENT OF SENTENCES (1) REASONING (1) REASONING ABILITY AND SHORT CUTS (1) REGIONAL RURAL BANKS (1) REGIONAL STATE Banks (1) RESERVE BANK OF INDIA (1) RESERVE BANK OF INDIA FUNCTIONS (1) SCHEDULED COMMERCIAL BANKS (1) SIDCS (1) SIMPLE - COMPOUND INTEREST (1) Software Fundamentals (1) State Bank and Nationalized Banks (1) SYLLOLOGISM SHORT CUTS FOR REASONING ABILITY (1) SYNONYMS ANTONYMS (1) TEST ON 100 GOLDEN RULES (1) TIME AND DISTANCE (1) TIME AND WORK (1) TRAINS (1) TYPES ALPHABET SERIES (1) Types Analogy (1) TYPES OF MARKETING RESEARCH (1) Varieties of credit cards (1) Windows operating system (1) మీ భవిషత్తు జాతకం (1) సంఖ్యా శాస్త్రం (1)

 
Design by Free WordPress Themes | Bloggerized by Lasantha - Premium Blogger Themes | Best Web Hosting